Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Farrell

Deceased

Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1820Born
15 Aug 184626.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Feb 185635.7AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
11 May 185635.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
26 Sep 187353.3DiedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Farrell (VIAF: 4462210)
Bishop John Farrell (born , died ) Bishop of Hamilton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArmagh, Archdiocese of Armagh, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopKingston, Diocese of Kingston, Ontario

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017