Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Phelan, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kingston, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1795BornBallyragget, Ireland
24 Sep 182530.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
20 Feb 184348.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
20 Feb 184348.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
20 Aug 184348.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
185256.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
8 May 185762.3SucceededBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
6 Jun 185762.3DiedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Patrick Phelan:
Bishop Patrick Phelan P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Kingston

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 135, and Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013