Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kingston

Archidioecesis Regiopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 December 1889
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 16,500 (6,373 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: K
  • Official Web Site: http://www.romancatholic.kingston.on.ca/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Diocesan Centre, 390 Palace Road, Kingston, Ontario K7L 4T3, Canada
  • Telephone: (613)548-4461
  • Fax: 548-4744

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Canada
12 January 1819ErectedDiocese of Québec Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Canada (erected)
Diocese of Kingston
27 January 1826ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Upper Canada Diocese of Kingston
17 December 1841Territory LostDiocese of Kingston Diocese of Toronto (erected)
25 June 1847Territory LostDiocese of Kingston
Diocese of Montréal
Diocese of Bytown (erected)
25 January 1874Territory LostDiocese of Kingston Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Canada (erected)
11 July 1882Territory LostDiocese of Kingston (Peterborough, Northumberland, Durham, and Victoria Counties)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Canada (Muskoka and Parry Sound Districts)
Diocese of Peterborough
Archdiocese of Kingston
28 December 1889ElevatedDiocese of Kingston Archdiocese of Kingston
21 January 1890Territory LostArchdiocese of Kingston (Glengarry, Stormont, and Cornwall Counties) Diocese of Alexandria in Ontario (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Kingston
195032,700240,55013.6%6326893673530147ap1951
196654,500260,00021.0%79241035293536051ap1967
197053,044250,00021.2%7715925761726453ap1971
197657,612262,00022.0%8181711228550ap1977
198062,138265,00023.4%787879630552ap1981
199077,009320,00024.1%74128689531222552ap1991
1999102,650315,00032.6%716771,333111118652ap2000
2000102,650315,00032.6%726781,316111118052ap2001
2001102,650315,00032.6%724761,35011918052ap2002
2002102,650315,00032.6%734771,33311917052ap2003
2003102,650315,00032.6%719801,283101316552ap2004
2004116,845315,00037.1%797861,358171116552ap2005
2006117,800321,00036.7%7410841,402181515551ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013