Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Cornelius O’Neill

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Regina, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1898BornKemptville
21 Dec 192729.8Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
4 Dec 194749.8AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
14 Apr 194850.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
26 Sep 197375.6RetiredArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
10 Jun 198385.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Cornelius O’Neill:
Archbishop Michael Cornelius O’Neill (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Regina

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013