Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maurice Cardinal Roy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Québec

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora del Santissimo Sacramento e Santi Martiri Canadesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1905BornQuébec
12 Jun 192722.3Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
22 Feb 194641.0AppointedBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
1 May 194641.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
8 Jun 194641.3AppointedBishop of Canada, Military
2 Jun 194742.3AppointedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
22 Feb 196560.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196560.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora del Santissimo Sacramento e Santi Martiri Canadesi
6 Jan 196761.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
6 Jan 196761.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
11 Jan 197367.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
15 Dec 197671.8ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
15 Dec 197671.8ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
15 Dec 197671.8ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
20 Mar 198176.1RetiredArchbishop of Québec, Canada
12 Mar 198277.1RetiredBishop of Canada, Military
24 Oct 198580.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Maurice Roy:
Maurice Cardinal Roy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Québec

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
  • a cardinal for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r/xlai/xjap: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015