Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Drainville

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amos, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1930Born
30 May 195323.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 197847.9AppointedBishop of Amos, Québec, Canada
12 Jun 197848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amos, Québec, Canada
3 May 200473.9ResignedBishop of Amos, Québec, Canada
11 May 201483.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Amos, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gérard Drainville
Bishop Gérard Drainville (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIle Du Pas
Ordained BishopStade, Amos, Diocese of Amos, Québec

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 May 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Jul 2020

Quantcast