Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Cadieux, O.M.I.

Bishop of Moosonee, Ontario

Bishop of Hearst, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1940 BornAlfred
17 Dec 196626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
26 Nov 199151.8AppointedBishop of Moosonee, Ontario, Canada
29 Mar 199252.1Ordained BishopBishop of Moosonee, Ontario, Canada
18 Jul 200666.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
25 Jul 200767.4AppointedBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
28 Sep 200767.6InstalledBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Vincent Cadieux:
Bishop Vincent Cadieux O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Moosonee

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Moosonee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,621

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013