Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Keewatin-Le Pas

Archidioecesis Kivotinus-Passitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Murray Chatlain, Archbishop
  • Sylvain Lavoie, O.M.I., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Peter Alfred Sutton, O.M.I., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 July 1967
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Manitoba
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 430,000 (166,087 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Kee
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofkeewatinlepas.ca/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 270, 76 First Street West, The Pas, MB R9A 1K4, Canada
  • Telephone: (204)623-6152
  • Fax: 623-6121

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Keewatin
4 March 1910ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Keewatin (erected)
15 July 1925Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Keewatin Prefecture Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay} (erected)
Archdiocese of Keewatin-Le Pas
13 July 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Keewatin Archdiocese of Keewatin-Le Pas (Name Changed and Vicariate raised to an Archdiocese)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Keewatin
195010,95430,95435.4%25355199821302ap1951
19656,00018,75032.0%51511177714438ap1967
Archdiocese of Keewatin-Le Pas
197023,00023,000100.0%59593898414557ap1971
197625,20067,15037.5%5151494731356ap1977
198024,90067,00037.2%5151488265754ap1981
199038,59593,56941.2%227291,3301303255ap1991
199943,481114,03938.1%315182,415171648ap2000
200042,103113,50537.1%317202,105191649ap2001
200143,578114,22438.2%316192,293181749ap2002
200242,916107,79739.8%412162,682131449ap2003
200342,739110,68938.6%411152,849121149ap2004
200442,218110,02538.4%610162,63811949ap2005
200641,869103,73540.4%310133,220111849ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013