Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson

Dioecesis Churchill-politanus-Sinus de Hudson



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Anthony Wieslaw Krótki, O.M.I., Bishop
  • Reynald Rouleau, O.M.I., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 29 January 1968
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Keewatin-Le Pas
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Manitoba
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 2,300,000 (888,375 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Ch
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 10, 242 La Verendrye, Churchill, MB R0B 0E0, Canada
  • Telephone: (204)675-2252
  • Fax: 675-2140

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
15 July 1925ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Keewatin Prefecture Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
21 December 1931ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay} Vicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
13 July 1945Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
Vicariate Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent
Diocese of Harbour Grace
Vicariate Apostolic of Labrador (erected)
Diocese of Churchill
13 July 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay} Diocese of Churchill
Diocese of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson
29 January 1968Name ChangedDiocese of Churchill Diocese of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
19501,1357,78214.6%25254531610ap1951
19662,78212,45622.3%2121132281414ap1967
Diocese of Churchill
Diocese of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson
19703,44014,31424.0%22221562812ap1971
19764,80019,20025.0%12324200291422ap1977
19805,10020,00025.5%1919268231023ap1981
19904,56020,84021.9%11516285171018ap1991
19996,85023,50029.1%1897619718ap2000
20007,03024,15029.1%771,0049518ap2001
20017,17024,78028.9%661,1957218ap2002
20027,47026,28028.4%771,0677218ap2003
20037,80027,00028.9%11217ap2004
20047,95027,50028.9%771,13518217ap2005
20068,30028,90028.7%771,1857117ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 21 Mar 2013