Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Labrador City-Schefferville

Dioecesis Labradorpolitanus-Scheffervillensis

Suppressed

To: Diocese of Amos and Diocese of Baie-Comeau and Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Labrador
13 July 1945ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
Vicariate Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent
Diocese of Harbour Grace
Vicariate Apostolic of Labrador (erected)
Diocese of Labrador-Schefferville
13 July 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Labrador Diocese of Labrador-Schefferville (Name Changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
Diocese of Labrador City-Schefferville
27 April 1987Name ChangedDiocese of Labrador-Schefferville Diocese of Labrador City-Schefferville
31 May 2007SuppressedDiocese of Labrador City-Schefferville (suppressed) Diocese of Amos (Nunavik Territory)
Diocese of Baie-Comeau (La Basse Côte Nord Territory)
Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador (Labrador Territory)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Labrador
19482,14010,30020.8%1010214184ap1951
196610,70035,00030.6%2727396382518ap1967
Diocese of Labrador-Schefferville
197019,08140,00047.7%126277063628ap1971
197621,45946,82945.8%20201,0723347ap1977
198017,87551,30434.8%121228123144ap1981
Diocese of Labrador City-Schefferville
199014,26447,94029.8%210121,188153925ap1991
199913,14645,73928.7%19101,3141111725ap2000
200014,33046,36530.9%12121,194132125ap2001
200114,04046,36530.3%113141,0021142125ap2002
200214,04046,36530.3%112131,0801142116ap2003
200314,12445,61331.0%111121,177132324ap2004
200414,54243,92433.1%212141,0381142324ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.6, 1 Jan 2012; data: 21 Jan 2012