Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador

Dioecesis Rivuli Angularis et Terrae Laboratoriae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Joseph Hundt, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 31 May 2007
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Newfoundland
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 310,302 (119,854 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Atlantic (Atlantique)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcchurch.com/
  • Mailing Address: St. Mary's on the Humber, 469 Curling Street, Corner Brook, NL A2H 3K8, Canada
  • Telephone: (709)639-7073
  • Fax: 639-8662

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s)
9 May 1870ErectedDiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland Prefecture Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s)
28 April 1892ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s) Vicariate Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s) (erected)
Diocese of Saint George’s
18 February 1904ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s) Diocese of Saint George’s (erected)
Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador
31 May 2007Name ChangedDiocese of Saint George’s Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador
31 May 2007Territory AddedDiocese of Labrador City-Schefferville (suppressed) Diocese of Amos (Nunavik Territory)
Diocese of Baie-Comeau (La Basse C“te Nord Territory)
Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador (Labrador Territory)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint George’s
195020,00060,00033.3%2162774066817ap1951
196622,80070,00032.6%296356518719ap1967
197040,98991,03645.0%30301,3661011020ap1971
197643,601125,34034.8%252271,614138921ap1977
198043,400120,00036.2%301311,400118321ap1981
199040,19399,88640.2%241251,60774923ap1991
199935,09784,02841.8%192211,67123021ap2000
200034,75492,87337.4%191201,73712821ap2001
200131,83897,23432.7%211221,44713921ap2002
200230,67981,84537.5%241251,22712521ap2003
200329,40874,14339.7%231241,22512120ap2004
200427,20166,50740.9%3113285012322ap2005
Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador
201343,700124,20035.2%233261,68031625ap2014
201645,190128,40035.2%1610261,738101426ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Apr 2018

Quantcast