Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Thomas McGrath

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1912Born
24 Jun 193624.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 197057.9AppointedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
22 Jul 197058.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
17 Jun 198573.0ResignedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
9 May 198774.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Richard Thomas McGrath
Bishop Richard Thomas McGrath (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint George’s

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOderin, Placentia Bay

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018