Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael O’Neill

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1903Born
24 Apr 192723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
8 Jun 194036.6AppointedBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
7 Jul 194036.6Ordained BishopBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
23 Nov 197269.0ResignedBishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada
2 Mar 197470.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Michael O’Neill
Bishop John Michael O’Neill (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Falls

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarbour Grace

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018