Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Anthony O’Sullivan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1886Born
5 Aug 191124.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 193144.1AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
7 May 193144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
18 May 193144.4InstalledBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
26 Feb 194457.2AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
14 Dec 196680.0RetiredArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
14 Dec 196680.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Maraguia
23 Nov 197083.9ResignedTitular Archbishop of Maraguia
6 Jun 197285.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony O’Sullivan
Archbishop Joseph Anthony O’Sullivan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamilton

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018