Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Maria Cardinal Mistrangelo, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1852Born
1871²18.6Simple VowsMember of Order of the Pious Schools
1874²21.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of the Pious Schools
18 Jul 187523.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
17 Mar 187724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
16 Jan 189340.7AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
22 Jan 189340.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
19 Jun 189947.1AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
1900²47.6AppointedSuperior General of Order of the Pious Schools
1904²51.6ResignedSuperior General of Order of the Pious Schools
6 Dec 191563.6Elevated to Cardinal
9 Dec 191563.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
7 Nov 193078.5DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Mistrangelo (VIAF: 89243944)
Alfonso Maria Cardinal Mistrangelo Sch. P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona, Diocese of Savona
Ordained PriestAquis
Ordained BishopS. Pantaleone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Buried Place (Original)Trespiano, Cemetery, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 113, and Page 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1893, Number 3
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017