Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Taccetti

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1861BornSan Miniatello
22 Mar 191755.3AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
20 May 191755.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
6 Apr 192058.4DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Taccetti:
Bishop Carlo Taccetti (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013