Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Massimiliano Novelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Colle di Val d’Elsa

Titular Bishop of Andrapa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1844BornCampi Bisenzio
21 Dec 186723.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 190359.1AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
29 Jun 190359.1Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
15 Jan 192176.6RetiredBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
15 Jan 192176.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Andrapa
14 Jul 192177.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Massimiliano Novelli:
Bishop Massimiliano Novelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Colle di Val d’Elsa

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 215
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 54
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013