Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Brettoni

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1864BornBarberino di Val d'Elsa
17 Dec 188723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
12 Oct 191046.0AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
13 Nov 191046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
5 May 191146.5InstalledBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
13 Nov 194581.1DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Brettoni:
Bishop Eduardo Brettoni (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 73
  • op/c1: CB, 31 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 2 Jan 2015