Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bonacini

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1904BornReggio Emilia
13 Oct 192925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
16 May 195954.9AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
29 Jun 195955.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
26 Jul 195955.1InstalledBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
14 Nov 196965.4DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bonacini:
Bishop Giuseppe Bonacini (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 59
  • opd/c1/i: CB, 31 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015