Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renato Spallanzani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1910BornScandiano
12 Jul 193625.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 196453.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
8 Sep 196453.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mazaca
11 Oct 196453.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mazaca
196756.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
23 Apr 197059.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siena, Italy
7 Oct 197564.9AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
2 Apr 198675.4RetiredBishop of Palestrina, Italy
17 May 200190.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Palestrina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Renato Spallanzani:
Bishop Renato Spallanzani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013