Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Costante Maltoni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Pakistan

Titular Archbishop of Thugga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1915BornForlimpopoli
26 Jun 193823.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 196751.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thugga
2 Jan 196751.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Pakistan
12 Mar 196752.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thugga
197054.8ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Pakistan
1 Feb 198064.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Costante Maltoni:
Archbishop Costante Maltoni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Pakistan

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015