Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Rozario

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dhaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1926BornSolepur
22 Dec 195630.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 196842.6AppointedBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
8 Dec 196842.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
17 Dec 197751.9AppointedArchbishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
9 Jul 200579.5RetiredArchbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh
18 Mar 200781.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dhaka, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Michael Rozario:
Archbishop Michael Rozario (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dhaka

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2005
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Apr 2014