Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moses Montu Costa, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chattogram, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1950Born
5 Feb 198130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
5 Jul 199645.6AppointedBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
6 Sep 199645.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
6 Apr 201160.3AppointedBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
27 May 201160.5InstalledBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
2 Feb 201766.2AppointedArchbishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
13 Jul 202069.6DiedArchbishop of Chattogram, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Moses Montu Costa
Archbishop Moses Montu Costa C.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop of Chattogram

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToomilla
Ordained BishopDinajpur, Diocese of Dinajpur
Death PlaceSquare, Hospital, Dhaka, Archdiocese of Dhaka

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2011
  • i: CB, 26 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,844
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2017
  • d: CB, 13 Jul 2020
  • mn: CB, 16 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jul 2020

Quantcast