Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Romen Boiragi

Bishop of Khulna, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1955 Born
13 Jan 198529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Khulna, Bangladesh
4 May 201257.0AppointedBishop of Khulna, Bangladesh
15 Jun 201257.1Ordained BishopBishop of Khulna, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for James Romen Boiragi
Bishop James Romen Boiragi (born ) Bishop of Khulna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoldibunia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Khulna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 10 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017