Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theotonius Gomes, C.S.C.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dhaka

Titular Bishop of Zucchabar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1939 BornMadbortek
19 Dec 196425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
19 Dec 197839.6AppointedBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
4 Apr 197939.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
23 Feb 199656.8ResignedBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
23 Feb 199656.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh
23 Feb 199656.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zucchabar
28 Apr 201475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Theotonius Gomes:
Bishop Theotonius Gomes C.S.C. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dhaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Dhaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015