Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Atul D’Rozario, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Khulna, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1925Born
10 Jun 195327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
21 Sep 197044.8AppointedBishop of Khulna, Bangladesh
13 Dec 197045.0Ordained BishopBishop of Khulna, Bangladesh
19 Feb 200579.2RetiredBishop of Khulna, Bangladesh
24 Feb 201690.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Khulna, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Michael Atul D’Rozario
Bishop Michael Atul D’Rozario C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Khulna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoyansree

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Feb 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017