Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Avedis Bédros XIV Arpiarian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1856Born
Mar 1884³27.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 189034.4AppointedBishop of Karput (Armenian), Turkey
16 Nov 189034.5Ordained BishopBishop of Karput (Armenian), Turkey
20 Apr 189842.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
20 Apr 189842.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus degli Armeni
27 Aug 191155.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
25 Jun 192872.1SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
25 Jun 192872.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus degli Armeni
17 Dec 192872.6ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
9 Oct 193175.4SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
16 Oct 193175.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
26 Oct 193781.5DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Avedis Bédros XIV Arpiarian
Patriarch Avedis Bédros XIV Arpiarian (born , died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEghin, Diocese of Karput (Armenian), Turkey
Ordained BishopIstanbul

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 328
  • b: CB, 15 Oct 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017