Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Pierre XVI (Louis) Batanian

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1899BornMardin
29 Jun 192122.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 193334.4AppointedBishop of Mardin (Armenian), Iraq
29 Oct 193334.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mardin (Armenian), Iraq
10 Aug 194041.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabula
6 Dec 195253.8AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
25 Apr 195960.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia
4 Sep 196263.5SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
15 Nov 196263.7ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
22 Apr 197677.1RetiredPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
9 Oct 197980.6DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Pierre XVI (Louis) Batanian:
Patriarch Ignace Pierre XVI (Louis) Batanian (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jul 2015