Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Apcar

Deceased

Bishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1884BornGiulfa
3 Nov 190723.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 195470.6SelectedBishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian), Iran
24 Sep 195470.7ConfirmedBishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian), Iran
21 Nov 195470.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian), Iran
9 Jul 196783.5DiedBishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian), Iran

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Apcar:
Bishop John Baptist Apcar (born , died ) Bishop of Ispahan {Esfáan)

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013