Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Stephan Bedros X Azarian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1826Born
14 Aug 187750.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
23 Sep 187750.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
6 Jul 188154.5SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
4 Aug 188154.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
1 May 189972.3DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Stephan Bedros X Azarian (VIAF: 46750373)
Patriarch Stephan Bedros X Azarian (born , died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Constantinople

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 204, and Page 414
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017