Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arsène Aïdynian, C.M.Vd. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

Titular Bishop of Salamis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1825Born
15 Mar 188762.1AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna
15 Mar 188762.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Salamis
11 Apr 188762.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salamis
21 Jul 190277.5DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

MicroData Summary for Arsène Aïdynian (VIAF: 64403937)
Bishop Arsène Aïdynian C.M.Vd. (born , died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCostantinopoli
Ordained BishopWien

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 491
  • b: MW, 26 Dec 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,887, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast