Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anton Josef Cardinal Gruscha

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1820BornVienna
15 Jul 184221.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
4 May 184322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
19 Jan 187857.2AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
28 Mar 187857.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
28 Apr 187857.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
24 Jan 189069.2SelectedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
23 Jun 189069.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
6 Jul 189069.7InstalledArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
1 Jun 189170.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 189171.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
5 Aug 191190.8DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Anton Josef Gruscha:
Cardinal Anton Josef Gruscha (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 185, and Page 591
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013