Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marijan Marković, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Titular Bishop of Danaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1840Born
25 Apr 186322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Observant Friars Minor
26 Apr 186322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Mar 188443.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
27 Mar 188443.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
4 May 188443.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
20 Jun 191271.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Marijan Marković (VIAF: 233309971)
Bishop Marijan Marković O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Banjaluka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDolac
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Vienne

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 140, and Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,884, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast