Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antun Maurović

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1851BornZagreb
25 Jul 187624.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Jul 187624.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 189544.0AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
27 Oct 189544.1Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
8 Feb 190856.4DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antun Maurović:
Bishop Antun Maurović (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 509

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 May 2014