Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josip Juraj Posilović

Deceased

Archbishop of Zagreb, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1834Born
1 Aug 185824.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Aug 185824.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 187641.9SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
26 Jun 187642.1ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
27 Aug 187642.3Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
17 Mar 189459.8SelectedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
18 May 189460.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
26 Apr 191480.0DiedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Juraj Posilović (VIAF: 267795486)
Archbishop Josip Juraj Posilović (born , died ) Archbishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIvanić-Grad, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 509, and Page 600
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1876, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017