Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Pavlešić

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1814³Born
23 Jan 183823.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Jan 183823.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 187156.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
14 Jul 187156.5AppointedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
3 Sep 187156.6Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
9 Sep 189378.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan Pavlešić
Bishop Ivan Pavlešić (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBania, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 145
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017