Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Gašparić

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1822Born
11 Jun 184422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Zagreb, Croatia
20 Apr 184523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
13 Nov 188462.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
13 Nov 188462.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
21 Dec 188462.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
21 Jul 189775.3DiedTitular Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Franz Gašparić
Bishop Franz Gašparić (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,884, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast