Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anđeo Kraljević, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Herzegovina

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1807Born
9 Dec 186456.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Herzegovina
9 Dec 186456.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
25 Mar 186557.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
27 Jul 187971.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Anđeo Kraljević (VIAF: 106800599)
Bishop Anđeo Kraljević O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Herzegovina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceČerigaj, Vicariate Apostolic of Herzegovina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zara, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 381
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017