Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josip Godeassi

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1788Born
21 Sep 181123.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 181224.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Oct 183951.1SelectedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
27 Apr 184051.6ConfirmedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
8 Dec 184052.2Ordained BishopBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
26 Feb 184354.4SelectedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
22 Jun 184354.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
5 Sep 186173.0DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Godeassi (VIAF: 305486387)
Archbishop Josip Godeassi (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedea
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
Death PlaceZara, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 219, and Page 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,840, Number 40
  • c34/bd/loc: ATh, 23 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,811

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast