Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuele Lodi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Udine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1770BornMilano
25 May 179322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Dec 181848.3SelectedBishop of Udine, Italy
23 Aug 181949.0ConfirmedBishop of Udine, Italy
24 Aug 181949.0Ordained BishopBishop of Udine, Italy
8 Feb 184574.4DiedBishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emmanuele Lodi
Bishop Emmanuele Lodi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Udine

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 385
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016