Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Zuppani

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1750³BornSedico
17 Dec 177424.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 181665.7SelectedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
23 Aug 181968.9ConfirmedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
26 Nov 184191.1DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Zuppani:
Bishop Luigi Zuppani (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

  • a priest for 66.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013