Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Martino Pellegrini

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Udine

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1748BornCeneda
19 Dec 177224.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 178637.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy
3 Apr 178637.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
14 May 178637.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
18 Feb 183081.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Martino Pellegrini
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Martino Pellegrini (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Udine

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 325, and Page 451
  • b: CB, 2 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: AT, 28 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,461
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016