Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Carlo Ciani

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1757BornCiconicco
22 Dec 178124.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 181860.8SelectedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
27 Sep 181961.8ConfirmedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
6 Feb 182062.2Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
31 Jul 182567.6DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Carlo Ciani:
Bishop Pietro Carlo Ciani (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013