Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marko Kalogjera (CalogerÓ)

Deceased

Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1819Born
20 Aug 184323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
27 Aug 184323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
29 Jan 185636.1SelectedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
19 Jun 185636.5ConfirmedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
7 Sep 185636.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
12 Mar 186646.2SelectedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
29 Oct 186646.8ConfirmedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
4 Dec 188868.9DiedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marko Kalogjera (CalogerÓ) (VIAF: 305487059)
Bishop Marko Kalogjera (CalogerÓ) (born , died ) Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlato (Korcula), Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zadar, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 192, and Page 526
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1856, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017