Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimiro Forlani

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1834Born
1 Dec 185622.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Mar 185723.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187238.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
6 May 187238.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
17 Nov 187238.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
12 May 187945.1AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
3 Aug 188753.4DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Forlani
Bishop Casimiro Forlani (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDernis, Diocese of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
Ordained BishopMakarska, Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193, and Page 217
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,872, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast