Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Zaffron (Zoffran)

Deceased

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1807Born
2 Sep 183225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
13 Nov 186255.4SelectedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
28 Sep 186356.3ConfirmedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
15 Nov 186356.4Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
13 Feb 187264.6SelectedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
29 Jul 187265.1ConfirmedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
16 Sep 188174.2DiedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Zaffron (Zoffran) (VIAF: 305698789)
Bishop Ivan Zaffron (Zoffran) (born , died ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCursola, Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)
Ordained BishopS. Marc, Curzola, Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 475, and Page 517
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1863, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017