Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juraj Duboković (Dubocovich)

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1800Born
2 Apr 182525.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 182525.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 186666.2AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
12 Aug 186666.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
21 Mar 187474.0DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Juraj Duboković (Dubocovich) (VIAF: 305605230)
Bishop Juraj Duboković (Dubocovich) (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePitve, Diocese of Hvar (Lesina)
Ordained BishopZadar, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017