Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vinko Cima

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1805Born
16 Oct 182924.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Oct 182924.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 185650.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
19 Jun 185650.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
23 Nov 185651.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
10 Nov 186762.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vinko Cima
Bishop Vinko Cima (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTragur
Ordained BishopS. Marc, Cathedral, Makarska, Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017