Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filip Dominik Bordini

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1775BornSkradin
4 Nov 179823.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 182651.3SelectedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Jun 182751.8ConfirmedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Nov 182752.3Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
31 Jul 183862.9SelectedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
21 Feb 183963.5ConfirmedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
25 Jul 186589.9DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Filip Dominik Bordini (VIAF: 305551262)
Bishop Filip Dominik Bordini (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 305, and Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016