Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantin Ernest Ruziczka (Růžička)

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1761BornTloskowiez
12 Jun 178523.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Jun 178523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Jun 181553.4SelectedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
8 Mar 181654.2ConfirmedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
25 Aug 181654.6Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
18 Mar 184583.2DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Constantin Ernest Ruziczka (Růžička)
Bishop Constantin Ernest Ruziczka (Růžička) (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 42
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 May 2016